DURHAM CITY YOUNG FARMER'S CLUB

Charity number: 504002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 03 October 2021 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 03 October 2021 398 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 03 October 2021 764 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 21 May 2018 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required