DURHAM CITY YOUNG FARMER'S CLUB

Charity number: 504002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £2.23k £2.58k £2.98k £1.73k £6.08k
Total expenditure £1.32k £3.34k £2.68k £1.55k £4.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A