EALING FOODBANK

Charity number: 1156369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £87.92k £77.64k £240.47k £292.83k £643.70k
Total expenditure £40.65k £56.08k £201.49k £279.05k £417.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £635.92k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.09k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.69k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £416.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £160
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £248