AGENDER EDUCATION

Charity number: 1155447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £18.04k £5.59k £10.71k £6.76k £372
Total expenditure £11.45k £10.18k £8.14k £9.10k £3.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £900 £100 £1.50k N/A