Trustees HEALTHWATCH CENTRAL BEDFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1154627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Ann Carter Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
KAREN PROCTOR Trustee 12 November 2019
KEECH HOSPICE CARE
Received: 3 days late
Paul Downing Trustee 01 May 2019
YOUTURN FUTURES
Received: On time
GILL HISCOX Trustee 01 November 2014
None on record
LINDA GRANT Trustee 01 November 2014
None on record
DAVE SIMPSON Trustee 21 August 2013
None on record