ALVECHURCH COMMUNITIES TOGETHER

Charity number: 1154840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 24 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 31 July 2020 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 31 July 2020 61 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 16 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 16 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 03 June 2018 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 June 2018 3 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 20 September 2017 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 20 September 2017 112 days late Download