ALVECHURCH COMMUNITIES TOGETHER

Charity number: 1154840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £60.48k £82.19k £71.19k £89.79k £93.73k
Total expenditure £74.60k £75.23k £71.83k £79.41k £79.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.70k £21.25k £9.85k £6.47k £8.50k