THE SHERIFF CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1155848
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.00k £10.00k £5.00k £29.63k £101.87k
Total expenditure £9.36k £11.44k £12.23k £16.55k £38.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A