FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S (MARKET WEIGHTON)

Charity number: 1153999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £2.44k £4.94k £5.39k £4.11k £713
Total expenditure £2.08k £5.18k £2.35k £3.33k £3.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A