THE JACKSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1157548
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 June 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 21 June 2021 21 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 06 January 2021 220 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 06 January 2021 220 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 28 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 23 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 31 May 2017 On time Download