Accounts and annual returns ALBANIAN EUROPEAN TRUST

Charity number: 1157017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 17 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 23 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 17 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required