Financial history ALBANIAN EUROPEAN TRUST

Charity number: 1157017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £3.36k £4.70k £2.46k £1.70k £2.11k
Total expenditure £1.97k £2.84k £885 £2.24k £2.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A