RAY (REFUGEE ACTION YORK)

Charity number: 1154065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Thomas Adamski Chair 06 June 2019 None on record
Sarah Nicholls Trustee 22 July 2020 None on record
Stephanie Ruth Cooper Trustee 19 January 2021 None on record
Aniko Sheppard Trustee 22 September 2020 None on record
Mary McCormack Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Marwa Dorai Trustee 22 September 2016 None on record
Scott Butterworth Trustee 22 September 2020 None on record
Annette Maas Trustee 06 June 2019 None on record