Financial history WEST TYTHERLEY PTA

Charity number: 1154103
Charity reporting is overdue by 352 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £8.91k £14.14k £16.30k £4.07k £2.72k
Total expenditure £9.98k £8.78k £16.08k £6.43k £3.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A