Financial history SCHOOLS OUT UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1156352
Charity reporting is overdue by 229 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £26.13k £19.64k £22.83k £22.84k £24.52k
Total expenditure £27.28k £21.33k £20.19k £20.49k £17.26k
Income from government contracts £3.99k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A