Financial history THE MELOS SINFONIA

Charity number: 1155338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £161.04k £54.00k £5.81k £81.66k £22.50k
Total expenditure £72.63k £113.02k £31.81k £76.54k £7.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A