Accounts and annual returns THE MELOS SINFONIA

Charity number: 1155338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 24 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 22 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window