DOWN SYNDROME DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1155830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £39.02k £32.71k £36.73k £70.51k £88.77k
Total expenditure £33.32k £23.33k £30.24k £60.82k £74.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A