DOWN SYNDROME DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1155830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 02 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 02 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 20 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 13 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 02 January 2018 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 January 2018 33 days late Download