Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SS PHILIP AND JAMES WITH ST MARGARET

Charity number: 1154947
Charity reporting is overdue by 249 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £164.41k £165.44k £172.79k £172.77k £93.38k
Total expenditure £161.25k £153.08k £203.28k £176.12k £100.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A