Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SS PHILIP AND JAMES WITH ST MARGARET

Charity number: 1154947
Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Daniel Geoffrey Thomas Walters Chair 01 December 2021
None on record
Thomas Philip Plant Trustee 27 June 2021
22ND OXFORD SEA SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Carol Joan Goodall Trustee 27 June 2021
None on record
Dr Uta Andrea Balbier Trustee 28 April 2019
OLIVER HEATON TRUST
Received: 113 days late
Susan Alexandra Harris Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Miss E Barsham Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Dr Hugh George Series Trustee 19 April 2015
OLIVER HEATON TRUST
Received: 113 days late
Professor Richard Anthony Cooper Trustee 06 April 2014
THE ST BENET'S TRUST
Chris Levick Trustee 06 April 2014
OLIVER HEATON TRUST
Received: 113 days late
MICHELE CLARE CRAWFORD Trustee 04 December 2013
THE STUDENT CROSS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ROGER TRAFFORD Trustee 04 December 2013
None on record
PROFESSOR VALENTINE DAVID CUNNINGHAM Trustee 04 December 2013
None on record