AL-INAM RELIEF FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1155458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 July 2020 12 June 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 25 July 2019 20 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 25 July 2018 01 August 2019 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 25 July 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 25 July 2016 03 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 July 2016 Not Required