AL-INAM RELIEF FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1155458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 25/07/2016 25/07/2017 25/07/2018 25/07/2019 25/07/2020
Total gross income £500 £75 £0 £1 £0
Total expenditure £383 £45 £0 £1 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A