Accounts and annual returns THE BILL LLOYD MEMORIAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1155515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 03 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 12 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 March 2021 301 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required