Financial history THE BILL LLOYD MEMORIAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1155515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £5.49k £5.46k £5.77k £5.17k £5.86k
Total expenditure £3.28k £6.78k £6.06k £5.62k £5.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A