Financial history CHESHIRE & NORTH WALES DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £770 £1.11k £1.14k £710 £1.21k
Total expenditure £2.21k £2.52k £1.88k £1.54k £1.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A