Governing document Cheshire ,North Wales & Wirrel Dyslexia Associaton
Charity number: 504184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUNE 1975, AMENDED 19 MAY 1981 AND 17 MAY 2000. AS AMENDED ON 22 JAN 2018 as amended on 27 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
"TO RELIEVE AND PROVIDE EDUCATION TO PERSONS HANDICAPPED BY DYSLEXIA".(FOR FURTHER DETAILS OF OBJECTS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF ABOVE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
1 CHESTER 2 STOCKPORT 3 TRAFFORD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.