EXPLORE CHRISTIAN CHARITY

Charity number: 1155546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2020 344 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 January 2020 344 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 February 2018 26 days late Download