EXPLORE CHRISTIAN CHARITY

Charity number: 1155546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £57.05k £56.88k £8.05k £0 £0
Total expenditure £56.68k £57.90k £7.42k £155 £151
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A