GURU GOBIND SINGH GURDWARA

Charity number: 1156991
Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 329 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 329 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 March 2020 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 March 2020 130 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 March 2020 495 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 March 2020 495 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 March 2020 860 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 March 2020 860 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 December 2019 1144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 19 December 2019 1144 days late