TOWER HAMLETS MISSION

Charity number: 1154842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £675.30k £644.30k £664.22k £711.66k £668.67k
Total expenditure £593.68k £581.61k £582.42k £603.29k £633.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £75.60k £65.81k £59.26k £117.34k £71.67k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £586.80k £565.25k £590.46k £579.15k £581.51k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.78k £13.12k £13.58k £11.87k £13.42k
Income - Other £119 £124 £929 £3.30k £2.07k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £51.10k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £585.68k £573.09k £573.57k £595.85k £625.01k
Expenditure - Raising funds £8.00k £8.52k £8.41k £7.44k £8.80k
Expenditure - Governance £23.71k £23.59k £0 £47.11k £49.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £443 £0 £0