THE PAT NEWMAN MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1155183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £78 £56 £86 £99 £1.98k
Total expenditure £245.54k £187.20k £174.97k £142.22k £164.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A