Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN AND LORNA WING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156443
Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 108 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 108 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window