Financial history THE JOHN AND LORNA WING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156443
Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £28.61k £28.02k £40.94k £23.00k £17.69k
Total expenditure £100.65k £51.79k £301.33k £299.79k £143.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A