LINCOLNSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity number: 504307
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £124.12k £87.61k £125.89k £233.39k £138.39k
Total expenditure £118.89k £70.46k £134.09k £206.20k £122.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.80k £0 N/A N/A N/A