CLOWNS WITHOUT BORDERS UK

Charity number: 1156987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tatiana Calliope Glanville-Wallis Trustee 09 May 2018 None on record
Dr unni krishnan Trustee 09 February 2018 None on record
David Lacey Chair 24 January 2020 None on record
Annabel Morgan Trustee 06 February 2016 None on record
Edward King Trustee 24 January 2020 None on record
Shilpa Thanki-Green Trustee 17 February 2021 None on record
Wendy Adele Lanchin Trustee 09 February 2018 None on record
Niki Charalampopoulou Trustee 09 February 2018 None on record