HIGHFIELD FRIENDS AND PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1155274
Charity reporting is up to date (133 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 November 2020 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 July 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 10 July 2017 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 27 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required