Trustees THE CHELLINGTON CENTRE

Charity number: 1156511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN ROBERT TUSTING OBE Chair 09 January 2014
CARLTON EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Venerable David John Middlebrook Trustee 29 July 2022
STEVENAGE PIONEER YOUTH TRUST
Received: On time
THE ST ALBANS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
ST ALBANS WOODLAND BURIAL TRUST
Received: On time
CHEW'S FOUNDATION AT DUNSTABLE
Received: On time
Edward Charles Chamberlayne Trustee 17 June 2022
None on record
Helen Margaret Simpson Trustee 23 February 2022
None on record
Peter Charles Hadfield Trustee 12 March 2021
None on record
James Charles Tusting Trustee 07 May 2019
None on record
RACHEL MARY LESITER Trustee 09 January 2014
None on record
SALLY ELIZABETH GILBERT Trustee 09 January 2014
None on record