ST AGNES MINERS AND MECHANICS INSTITUTE (2013)

Charity number: 1156072
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 February 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 February 2020 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 March 2019 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 March 2019 29 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 June 2018 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 June 2018 134 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 February 2017 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 October 2017 247 days late Download