ST AGNES MINERS AND MECHANICS INSTITUTE (2013)

Charity number: 1156072
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £114.47k £589.04k £113.64k £103.94k
Total expenditure £0 £115.80k £134.32k £122.66k £106.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £486.93k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £93.86k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £8.25k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £26.80k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £98.37k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £9.15k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £9.15k N/A N/A