Financial history BURY ST EDMUNDS ISLAMIC CULTURAL ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1158903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £17.50k £15.70k £15.92k £12.71k £2.45k
Total expenditure £10.75k £2.65k £4.36k £8.35k £2.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A