Financial history DACORUM BANGLADESHI WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1156157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 30/06/2018 01/04/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £26.54k £30.76k £23.85k £27.27k £32.03k
Total expenditure £12.05k £9.66k £6.40k £8.45k £47.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A