Accounts and annual returns DACORUM BANGLADESHI WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1156157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2019 01 March 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 22 October 2019 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 12 June 2019 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window