Financial history BLACK COUNTRY WHEELS

Charity number: 1157795
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £475.18k £606.11k £651.46k £564.83k £662.95k
Total expenditure £440.13k £454.68k £454.68k £498.39k £539.65k
Income from government contracts £427.73k £411.82k £647.93k £480.00k £539.65k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £21.60k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.30k £3.52k £3.52k £21.60k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £604.82k £647.93k £647.93k £636.41k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £4.95k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £454.68k £454.68k £498.22k £539.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £170 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0