Trustees LEEDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Charity number: 1155876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nicholas Baines | Chair | 08 June 2014 |
|
|||||||||
The Rt Revd Madhu Smitha Prasadam | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
The Right Reverend Anna Eltringham | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Roger Andrew Lazenby | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Gary Richard Waddington BTh MA SSC | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|||||||||
RICHARD ANTHONY PATTINSON | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Rt Revd Arun Arora | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Jan Ali | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Eve Rebecca Ridgeway | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Christopher Gordon Thompson | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Jane Catherine Evans | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||
MARILYN BANISTER | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Canon Mr JOHN IRVING WARNETT | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||
The Revd Canon Rachel Naomi Firth | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
The Venerable Paul Nicholas Ayers | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
MATTHEW JOHN AMBLER | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
The Very Revd John Richard Dobson | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||
THE RT REVD DR TOBY MATTHEW HOWARTH | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||
ANDREW ALEXANDER MAUDE TD | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||
THE RT REVD Anthony William Robinson SSC | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.