ROCK FIRE RAIN

Charity number: 1157735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £5.00k £5.00k £0 £200 £3.30k
Total expenditure £3.42k £4.09k £1.39k £845 £3.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A