READ ACADEMY EDUCATION

Charity number: 1156203
Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £106.69k £212.12k £325.43k £463.57k £399.54k
Total expenditure £82.44k £206.99k £303.08k £398.80k £430.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A