TRINITY & ST. MICHAEL'S SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1155595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.98k £9.59k £9.51k £9.32k £6.06k
Total expenditure £10.10k £6.36k £3.64k £11.12k £3.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A