WELSH BLACK CATTLE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1159937
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £101.28k £104.33k £107.78k £100.70k £94.72k
Total expenditure £109.14k £117.37k £111.81k £101.03k £75.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A