HOME-START ST. HELENS LTD.

Charity number: 1155988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £141.12k £133.04k £121.37k £185.43k £130.41k
Total expenditure £132.91k £124.55k £123.64k £135.70k £95.01k
Income from government contracts £91.11k £104.00k £93.18k £74.92k £87.06k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A